This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 17:04:22 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. John Villanueva Brown, Junior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against John Villanueva Brown, Junior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4948

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Brown, John Villanueva, Junior

Brown, John Villanueva

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/08/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC261(a)(4): Rape/Victim Unconscious At The Time Of Act; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC243.4(a): Sexual Battery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Brown, John Villanueva, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Brown, John Villanueva, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Brown, John Villanueva, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Brown, John Villanueva, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC243.4(a): Sexual Battery; Statute: 243.4(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Brown, John Villanueva, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Brown, John Villanueva, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC261(a)(4): Rape/Victim Unconscious At The Time Of Act; Statute: 261(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gates, Kathryn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margain, Andre Carlos