Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2021 at 18:01:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jesus Pereznieblas, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jesus Pereznieblas, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Ash, Carol and Hollman, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0876

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Ash, Carol

Hollman, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pereznieblas, Jesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Nored, Thane

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Fuentes, Carlos

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

04/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/16/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/16/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Retained: Fuentes, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Retained: Fuentes, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Pereznieblas, Jesus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Pereznieblas, Jesus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC289(b): Sexual Penetration/Foreign Object/Consent; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Charge #: 004; Description: PC289(b): Sexual Penetration/Foreign Object/Consent; Statute: 289(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Charge #: 003; Description: PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Statute: 288(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Charge #: 002; Description: PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Statute: 288(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Pereznieblas, Jesus; Charge #: 001; Description: PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Statute: 288(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silveira, Nicole A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nored, Thane