This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 17:01:47 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jesus Antonio Mesa-Santos, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jesus Antonio Mesa-Santos, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4076

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

09/20/2021: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Order

09/20/2021: Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCourt Collections Follow-up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionProbation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a)/23550: Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 09/20/2021; Term Type: Middle; Term: 2 Years; Stayed: 2 Years; Stayed Reason: Program Referral; Comment: Count 1- Felony; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/20/2021; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/19/2024; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/20/2021; Programs; Residential Treatment Program to be determined; Ordered; Party: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Order Date: 09/20/2021; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Comment; Comment: ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a)/23550: Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 001; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b)/23550: Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Three PriorDUI Violations-Felony; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a)/23550: Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialMesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Transaction Assessment; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a)/23550: Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b)/23550: Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Three PriorDUI Violations-Felony; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 003; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Charge #: 003; Description: VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b)/23550: Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Three PriorDUI Violations-Felony; Statute: 23152(b)/23550; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Mesa-Santos, Jesus Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a)/23550: Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; Statute: 23152a-23550; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boortz, Kimberly Ann