This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 17:01:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. James Rolando Ventura, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against James Rolando Ventura, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******733C

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ventura, James Rolando

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/08/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/08/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

02/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Ventura, James Rolando; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Ventura, James Rolando; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 005; PC30605: Possess Any Assault Weapon; Arrest Only; Charge Number: 006; PC186.22(b)(1): Street Gang Act:Conv Felony; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC30605(a): Possess Any Assault Weapon; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 004; PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Ventura, James Rolando; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 006; Description: PC186.22(b)(1): Street Gang Act:Conv Felony; Statute: 186.22(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 005; Description: PC30605: Possess Any Assault Weapon; Statute: 30605; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 004; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 004; Description: PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 002; Description: PC30605(a): Possess Any Assault Weapon; Statute: 30605(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ventura, James Rolando; Charge #: 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent