This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:23:02 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. James Henry Ortega, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against James Henry Ortega, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Ash, Carol, Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4193

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Ash, Carol

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ortega, James Henry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

Compton, Misty

Sandhaus, David

Asdorian, Blake M

Egan, Gerad Denis

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Green, Anthony C

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Release Order

12/13/2018: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/02/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

10/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

10/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/23/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/03/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

08/24/2018: Release Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

08/24/2018: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Probation; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/24/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/15/2021; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/24/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 09/20/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Ortega, James Henry; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Ortega, James Henry; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Ortega, James Henry; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKean, Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandhaus, David

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis