Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 01:34:47 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. James Edward Tillmon, Junior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against James Edward Tillmon, Junior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, McNatt, Bobby W., Mewhinney, Douglas V. and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5461

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

McNatt, Bobby W.

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Tillmon, James Edward, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

Creeger, Matthew L

Compton, Misty

Wall, Walter W.

Egan, Gerad Denis

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/31/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

03/26/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Abstract of Judgment

10/13/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Order

10/06/2017: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/11/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/06/2017: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/06/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • DispositionAmended Mandatory Supervision; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Mandatory Supervision; Probation; Type: Mandatory Supervision; Start Date: 09/11/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/13/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/11/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 03/29/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 05/16/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 08/16/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 05/08/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 11/13/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 11/13/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 209 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 15 Days; Conduct Credit: 14 Days; Comment: Mandatory Community Supervision VOP #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 005; VOP # 3 PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 005; VOP # 3 PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 005; VOP # 3 PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Mandatory Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Charge #: 005; Description: VOP # 3 PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Statute: 1170(h)(5)(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FinancialTillmon, James Edward, Junior; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFelony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Wall, Walter W.; Defendant: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Wall, Walter W.; Defendant: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Tillmon, James Edward, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony - Second Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott