This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 17:02:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Isaiah Nathaniel Lopez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Isaiah Nathaniel Lopez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hansen, Ronald, Bacciarini, Mark, Slocum, Steven and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4691

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hansen, Ronald

Bacciarini, Mark

Slocum, Steven

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lopez, Isaiah Nathaniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gates, Kathryn

Asdorian, Blake M

Asdorian, Blake M.

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Lope, Armando

Coughlin, Michael

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/27/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

10/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Lopez, Isaiah Nathaniel; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Lopez, Isaiah Nathaniel; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Isaiah Nathaniel; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Isaiah Nathaniel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas