This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 16:07:47 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Hubaldo Duarte Silva, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/18/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Hubaldo Duarte Silva, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian, Hollman, James, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Bacciarini, Mark, Slocum, Steven, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3332

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Hollman, James

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Bacciarini, Mark

Slocum, Steven

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Duarte, Hubaldo Silva

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Compton, Misty

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Asdorian, Blake M

Bakich, Donna

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Rodriguez, Adam J

Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

Hutson, Tina

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Andrade, Vincent

Rhodes, Leanna M

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

11/21/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/31/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

10/24/2019: Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

10/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/02/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

09/30/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Release Order

09/16/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

06/20/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

06/08/2019: Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgram Status; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 06/13/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/13/2021; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/13/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/31/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 03/18/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 09/16/2019; Status; Status: Extended; Date: 09/16/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/02/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 11/21/2019; Programs; Teen Challenge; Ordered; Party: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Order Date: 11/21/2019; Enroll by Date: 12/09/2019; Duration: 1 Years

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 008; VOP # 3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 008; VOP # 3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day 2nd Collection Notice (No Civil Assessment)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC240: Assault; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Martinez, Mathew Joseph; Defendant: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Charge #: 004; Description: PC240: Assault; Statute: 240; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Charge #: 003; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Duarte, Hubaldo Silva; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ, MATHEW JOSEPH