Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/12/2020 at 23:15:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Guadalupe Sarabia, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/30/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Guadalupe Sarabia, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bissig, Louis F., Schechter, Jeanne, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Jacobs, Harry, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******443B

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bissig, Louis F.

Schechter, Jeanne

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

Rosenthal, Sara R

Madayag, Kimberly

Compton, Misty

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Gates, Kathryn

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Berger, Richard

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Loethen, Christopher Paul

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Green, Anthony C

Davis, William A

 

Court Documents

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/10/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

10/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

10/11/2018: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

05/11/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

05/10/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

04/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

03/27/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

12/22/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/16/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

06/12/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

FTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

04/20/2017: FTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

Release Order

02/21/2017: Release Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

06/01/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

06/01/2015: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Request

05/26/2015: Request

Complaint

02/02/2015: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DispositionAmended Mandatory Supervision; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC530.5: Use Others Identity To Obtain Credit, Etc.; Mandatory Supervision; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 06/01/2015; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/17/2018; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/01/2015; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/03/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 02/21/2017; Status; Status: Extended; Date: 02/21/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/16/2017; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 12/22/2017; Comment: VOP Admitted; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 03/29/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 04/12/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 05/11/2018; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 10/17/2018; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 10/17/2018; Term Type: Lower; Term: 16 Months; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 136 Days; Conduct Credit: 136 Days; Comment: Count 2, felony; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00; Condition - Adult

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 007; VOP # 4PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 007; VOP # 4PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • FinancialSarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 007; VOP # 4PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2015
  • Docket60-Day Rule; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketArraigned: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Madayag, Kimberly; Defendant: Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Charge #: 003; Description: PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Charge #: 002; Description: PC530.5: Use Others Identity To Obtain Credit, Etc.; Statute: 530.5; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • ChargeCharges: Sarabia, Guadalupe Pena; Charge #: 001; Description: PC476: Make/Pass Fictitious Check; Statute: 476; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madayag, Kimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKean, Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gates, Kathryn