Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 01:56:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Guadalupe Hernandez Ramirez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Guadalupe Hernandez Ramirez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bissig, Louis F., Schechter, Jeanne, Shaver, Donald, Breen, Thomas P., Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1772

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bissig, Louis F.

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

Breen, Thomas P.

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Sandhaus, David

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Compton, Misty

Min, Thomas K

Gates, Kathryn

McKinney, Ilia C.

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

02/19/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

02/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

02/08/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

02/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

06/06/2018: Evaluation Request

Criminal: Minute Order

05/31/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

04/20/2017: Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

11/28/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Complaint

03/15/2016: Complaint

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • FinancialRamirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Transaction Assessment; $795.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • FinancialRamirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/14/2019; Concurrent: 15CR-01370; Term Type: Middle; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 316 Days; Conduct Credit: 316 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony pursuant to PC11370(h); Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 04/13/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 02/14/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/13/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 02/21/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/14/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 02/14/2019; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionAmended Disposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP#2PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP#2PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialRamirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC594(a)(3): Vandalism:Destroy Other's Property; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Charge #: 004; Description: PC594(a)(3): Vandalism:Destroy Other's Property; Statute: 594(a)(3); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Charge #: 003; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirez, Guadalupe Hernandez; Charge #: 001; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael