This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/04/2022 at 17:00:59 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Gerardo Daniel Sarragozavega, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gerardo Daniel Sarragozavega, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******150A

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Defendant Attorneys

Tenenbaum, Jeffrey A

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/07/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

01/20/2022: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant; Retained: Tenenbaum, Jeffrey A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC213(a)(1)(A): Robbery Committed By Two Or More People; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(a)(1): Involve Firearm:Armed Or Not; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC245(d)(1): Assault With Firearm On Peace Officer/Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC12022(a)(1): Involve Firearm:Armed Or Not; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Charge #: 004; Description: PC12022(a)(1): Involve Firearm:Armed Or Not; Statute: 12022(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Charge #: 004; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Charge #: 003; Description: PC245(d)(1): Assault With Firearm On Peace Officer/Firearm; Statute: 245(d)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Charge #: 002; Description: PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Statute: 182(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022(a)(1): Involve Firearm:Armed Or Not; Statute: 12022(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Sarragozavega, Gerardo Daniel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC213(a)(1)(A): Robbery Committed By Two Or More People; Statute: 213(a)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tenenbaum, Jeffrey A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent