This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 18:01:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Garrett Alexander Brown, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Garrett Alexander Brown, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1072

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Brown, Garrett Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadhwani, Anil Kamal

Defendant Attorney

Shiffrin, Joshua P

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

04/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Defendant: Brown, Garrett Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sadhwani, Anil Kamal; Defendant: Brown, Garrett Alexander; Deputy Public Defender: Shiffrin, Joshua P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sadhwani, Anil Kamal; Defendant: Brown, Garrett Alexander; Deputy Public Defender: Shiffrin, Joshua P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Brown, Garrett Alexander; Charge #: 001; Description: PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Statute: 166(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shiffrin, Joshua P