This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 00:31:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Gage Anthony England, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gage Anthony England, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, Hashimoto, Roy, Schechter, Jeanne and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******660A

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Hashimoto, Roy

Schechter, Jeanne

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

England, Gage Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pfeiff, Thomas M

McAfee, Michael

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Rodriguez, Adam J

Adams, Regina Sonja Lea

Andrade, Vincent

Rhodes, Leanna M

 

Court Documents

Collection Statement

07/17/2019: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

07/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

06/27/2019: Notice

Release Order

06/14/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Memorandum

05/10/2019: Memorandum

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

04/26/2019: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

04/26/2019: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

04/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

04/10/2019: Fingerprint Card

Declaration

04/10/2019: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

04/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • FinancialEngland, Gage Anthony; Transaction Assessment; $2355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCourt Collections Order of Referral for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Probation with Program; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/01/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 172 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 86 Days; Conduct Credit: 86 Days; Comment: Count 1 Felony; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 04/26/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/25/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/26/2019; Fee Totals; $40.00; $40.00; $30.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $140.00; Programs; Residential Treatment Program to be determined; Ordered; Party: England, Gage Anthony; Order Date: 04/26/2019; Duration: 1 Years; Comment: City Teen Program in Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgram Status; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgram Status; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: England, Gage Anthony; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: England, Gage Anthony; Contract Public Defender: Rhodes, Leanna M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 005; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Arrest Only; Charge Number: 006; PC148: Resisting an Officer; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • ChargeCharges: England, Gage Anthony; Charge #: 006; Description: PC148: Resisting an Officer; Statute: 148; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • ChargeCharges: England, Gage Anthony; Charge #: 005; Description: PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Statute: 647(f); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • ChargeCharges: England, Gage Anthony; Charge #: 004; Description: PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Statute: 484(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • ChargeCharges: England, Gage Anthony; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • ChargeCharges: England, Gage Anthony; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rhodes, Leanna M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adams, Regina Sonja Lea

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodriguez, Adam J