This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 18:01:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Fredie Zavala Castillo, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Fredie Zavala Castillo, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4562

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Castillo, Fredie Zavala

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Boyer, Kayla A

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/21/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

10/05/2021: Information

Information Amended

10/14/2021: Information Amended

Notice

10/14/2021: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Consolidated Complaint

11/05/2021: Consolidated Complaint

Request

11/05/2021: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

11/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

11/16/2021: Motion

Notice

11/18/2021: Notice

Motion

11/19/2021: Motion

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Original Type: Request; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; ++PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 002; ++PC245(a)(2): Assault With Firearm On Person; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; ++PC12022.5(a): Used Firearm:Commission Of Fel; Denied; Charge Number: 002; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 003; ++PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 004; ++PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 005; ++PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 005; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 006; ++PC25400(a)(1): Carry Concealed Weapon In Vehicle; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 006; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 007; ++PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 007; ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 008; ++HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketWitness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: 1st****PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: ++PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC186.22(b)(1)(B): Serious Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(B); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(B): Serious Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(B); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: 1st****PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: ++PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon