This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 18:01:01 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Fredie Zavala Castillo, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Fredie Zavala Castillo, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David, Lo, Paul and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4559

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Castillo, Fredie Zavala

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Boyer, Kayla A

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/21/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Castillo, Fredie Zavala

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 003; Description: VC21453(a): Red Signal-Vehicular Responsibilities (TSE); Statute: 21453(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 002; Description: VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Castillo, Fredie Zavala; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon