Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 14:09:05 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Frankie Lucio, Junior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Frankie Lucio, Junior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, Jacobs, Harry, Kirihara, John and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4305

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Jacobs, Harry

Kirihara, John

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lucio, Frankie, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Compton, Misty

Rosenthal, Sara R

Min, Thomas K

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Anthony C

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

Herman, George H, III

Elgin, David

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/08/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Returned Mail

04/02/2019: Returned Mail

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

03/12/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

08/17/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

08/03/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/03/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/20/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

07/19/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

FTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

03/20/2017: FTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

Affidavit of Probation Violation

02/02/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

09/07/2016: Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

Order

08/22/2016: Order

Order

07/22/2016: Order

* Public *

07/22/2016: * Public *

Declaration

06/30/2016: Declaration

Complaint

06/30/2016: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialLucio, Frankie, Junior; Counter Payment; Receipt # CL-2019-09752; Lucio, Frankie, Junior; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCourt Collections Order of Referral for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgram Status; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Elgin, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Sentence; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 07/22/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/14/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/22/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 02/03/2017; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/27/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 08/03/2017; Programs; Salvation Army; Ordered; Party: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Order Date: 08/03/2017; Duration: 6 Months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 011; VOP#2-PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 011; VOP#2-PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 009; Description: PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Statute: 484(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 008; Description: VC21801(a): Violation Of Right-Of-Way-Left Turn (TSE); Statute: 21801(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 007; Description: VC14601.1(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-Not Driving Ability; Statute: 14601.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 006; Description: VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Statute: 20002(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 005; Description: PC186.22(b)(1): Street Gang Act:Conv Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: PC417(a)(2): Exhibit Firearm (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 417(a)(2); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC417(a)(2)(A): Exhibit Firearm In A Public Place; Statute: 417(a)(2)(A); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.5(a)/(D): Spec Alleg-Use Of Firearm; Statute: 12022.5(a)/(D); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lucio, Frankie, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKinney, Ilia C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wall, Walter W.