This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/02/2021 at 18:04:22 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Frank Romano

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Frank Romano. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Lo, Paul and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2206

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Romano, Frank Nicholas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Her, Lee

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorneys

Page, Kathleen Coleen

Albertoni, Susan L

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/03/2021: Complaint

Bail Bond

06/07/2021: Bail Bond

Criminal: Minute Order

06/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

06/09/2021: Fingerprint Card

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

07/21/2021: Declaration

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Romano, Frank Nicholas; Contract Public Defender: Albertoni, Susan L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Romano, Frank Nicholas; Contract Public Defender: Albertoni, Susan L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Romano, Frank Nicholas; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Romano, Frank Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Romano, Frank Nicholas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Statute: 182(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albertoni, Susan L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen