This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 17:02:48 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Francisco Moran-Soltero, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Francisco Moran-Soltero, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4083

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Moran Soltero, Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Silveira, Nicole A.

Keller, Maureen Ann

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Garcia, John A

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC220(a)(1): Assault with intent to commit a felony; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC664/243.4(a): Attempt Willful/Unlawful Touch Intimate Part; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 005; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 006; PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 007; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Keller, Maureen Ann; Defendant: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Retained: Garcia, John A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Retained: Garcia, John A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 007; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 006; Description: PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 005; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 004; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 003; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 002; Description: PC664/243.4(a): Attempt Willful/Unlawful Touch Intimate Part; Statute: 664/243.4(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moran Soltero, Francisco; Charge #: 001; Description: PC220(a)(1): Assault with intent to commit a felony; Statute: 220(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garcia, John A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent