This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:00:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Francis Joseph George,Jr. Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Francis Joseph George,Jr Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4807

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

George, Francis Joseph, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

11/10/2021: Information

Criminal: Minute Order

11/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Other Documents Not Listed

11/23/2021: Other Documents Not Listed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Information; Original Type: Arraignment: Information; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: George, Francis Joseph, Junior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: George, Francis Joseph, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas