Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 23:52:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Fernando Arellano Jr, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 02/08/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Fernando Arellano Jr, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******733C

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Arellano, Fernando

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Her, Lee

Margain, Andre Carlos

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Rosenthal, Sara R

Sadhwani, Anil Kamal

Creeger, Matthew L

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Boyer, Kayla A

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Elgin, David

Andrade, Vincent

Loethen, Christopher

Berger, Richard

Loethen, Christopher Paul

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/23/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/06/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

08/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

04/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/11/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/06/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/24/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/20/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sadhwani, Anil Kamal; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Retained: Loethen, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Retained: Loethen, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Retained: Loethen, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant; Retained: Loethen, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant; Retained: Loethen, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Retained: Loethen, Christopher Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Retained: Loethen, Christopher Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant; Retained: Loethen, Christopher Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Retained: Loethen, Christopher Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Retained: Loethen, Christopher Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Retained: Loethen, Christopher Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Arellano, Fernando; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Arellano, Fernando; Charge #: 001; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sadhwani, Anil Kamal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R