This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 18:01:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Felix Ramon Zaragoza, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Felix Ramon Zaragoza, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Lo, Paul and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2663

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Zaragoza, Felix Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Margain, Andre Carlos

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/11/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Request

08/05/2021: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

08/02/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/29/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

06/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Original Type: Request; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Original Type: Request; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketBHRS Assessment - Jail Clinician

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSubpoenaed: Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Charge #: 001; Description: PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Statute: 451(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Zaragoza, Felix Ramon; Charge #: 002; Description: PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Statute: 451(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene