This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:22:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Fabian Lizarragaguzman, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Fabian Lizarragaguzman, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******205A

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Lizarragaguzman, Fabian

Lizarraga, Fabian Guzman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McCoy, Tyson John

Madayag, Kimberly

McKean, Tyler

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/09/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

08/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

08/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

10/05/2018: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Abstract of Judgment

10/09/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

10/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

11/29/2018: Notice

Request

08/13/2019: Request

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 10/05/2018; Term Type: Lower; Term: 16 Months; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 60 Days; Conduct Credit: 60 Days; Comment: Count 3 Felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $600.00; $30.00; $40.00; Fee Totals; $670.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Stricken; Charge Number: 002; PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Stricken; Charge Number: 003; PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 004; PC594(a): Vandalism; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • FinancialLizarragaguzman, Fabian; Transaction Assessment; $670.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFelony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 006; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 005; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 004; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 003; Description: PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Statute: 182(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Lizarragaguzman, Fabian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madayag, Kimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McCoy, Tyson John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKean, Tyler