Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 23:05:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Everardo Ortiz, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Everardo Ortiz, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, Ash, Carol, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Hansen, Ronald, Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4625

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Ash, Carol

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Ortiz, Everardo

Ortiz, Everrado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mckinney, Michael C

Rosenthal, Sara R

Margain, Andre Carlos

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Anthony C

Jamieson, Stephanie L

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

05/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

05/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

07/21/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

07/21/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/14/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

06/09/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/09/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/06/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/23/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

05/18/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

* Public *

05/16/2017: * Public *

Order

05/16/2017: Order

Complaint

09/04/2015: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DispositionAmended Commitment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Commitment; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 05/16/2017; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 06/14/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 05/16/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/21/2017; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 06/14/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 06/14/2019; Consecutive: 17CR-01609; Term Type: 1/3 Middle; Term: 1 Year; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 0 Day; Comment: Count 1 Felony; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00; Condition - Adult

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • FinancialOrtiz, Everardo; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Ortiz, Everardo; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 005; VOP#1PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Found True by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Ortiz, Everardo; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC236: False Imprisonment; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Wall, Walter W.; Defendant: Ortiz, Everardo; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Ortiz, Everardo; Charge #: 003; Description: PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Ortiz, Everardo; Charge #: 002; Description: PC236: False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Ortiz, Everardo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mckinney, Michael C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKinney, Ilia C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wall, Walter W.