This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 18:03:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Ernest Weger Uribe, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ernest Weger Uribe, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5421

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Uribe, Ernest Weger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Asdorian, Blake M.

Boyer, Kayla A

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Siegel, Mark Lloyd

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/05/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DispositionCommitment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Commitment; Charge Number: 002; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Commitment; Placement; Condition - Adult

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Court deems defendant not competent; Charge Number: 002; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Court deems defendant not competent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Uribe, Ernest Weger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Uribe, Ernest Weger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Uribe, Ernest Weger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Uribe, Ernest Weger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Uribe, Ernest Weger; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Uribe, Ernest Weger; Charge #: 001; Description: PC484(a): Theft:Prsonl Prop-Grand/Petty Theft (Specify); Statute: 484(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siegel, Mark Lloyd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando