This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 16:01:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Ernest Weger Uribe, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ernest Weger Uribe, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, Lo, Paul and Foster, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2065

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Uribe, Ernest Weger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

06/01/2021: Bail Bond

Complaint

05/27/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

05/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Uribe, Ernest Weger; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Uribe, Ernest Weger; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R