This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 00:55:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Eric Madero, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Eric Madero, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mewhinney, Douglas V., Kirihara, John, Breen, Thomas P., Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Hansen, Ronald and LaPorte, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5243

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Kirihara, John

Breen, Thomas P.

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

LaPorte, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Madero, Eric Cruz

Cruz, Eric Madero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Hegland, Caleb

Carroll, Robert

Creeger, Matthew L

Gates, Kathryn

Turner, Leslie Allan

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Albertoni, Susan L

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

10/09/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

09/30/2019: Proof of Service

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

08/21/2019: Converted Minute Order

Information Amended

08/14/2019: Information Amended

Exhibit List

08/14/2019: Exhibit List

Motion

08/14/2019: Motion

Converted Minute Order

08/14/2019: Converted Minute Order

Order

07/31/2019: Order

Declaration

07/31/2019: Declaration

Request Media Coverage

07/29/2019: Request Media Coverage

Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage

07/29/2019: Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

07/23/2019: Proof of Service

Criminal: Minute Order

07/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOrder For Victim Restitution; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketOrder For Victim Restitution; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestitution; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Madero, Eric Cruz; Contract Public Defender: Albertoni, Susan L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Prison; Charge Number: 001; **PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 10/01/2019; Comment: Count 1- Felony; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 10/01/2019; Consecutive: 1; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 1 Year; Comment: Enhancement 1; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; $10,000.00; Fee Totals; $10,070.00; Condition - Adult

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Hegland, Caleb; Defendant: Madero, Eric Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Madero, Eric Cruz; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant: Madero, Eric Cruz; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Madero, Eric Cruz; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Statute: 12022(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Madero, Eric Cruz; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Statute: 12022(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Madero, Eric Cruz; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Statute: 187(a)(1203.075); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Madero, Eric Cruz; Charge #: 001; Description: PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Statute: 187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carroll, Robert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hegland, Caleb