This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 18:02:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Emari Prescott, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Emari Prescott, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******418A

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Prescott, Emari

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Creeger, Matthew L

Gates, Kathryn

Roland, Tracy Marie

Asdorian, Blake M.

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas C

Coughlin, Michael

Siegel, Mark Lloyd

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/05/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/16/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Prescott, Emari; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Prescott, Emari; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M.; Defendant: Prescott, Emari; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M.; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M.; Defendant: Prescott, Emari

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 002; Description: PC12022.53(c): Fire Firearm; Statute: 12022.53(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 002; Description: PC189: Offense Was Willful, Deliberate, Premeditated; Statute: 189; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 002; Description: PC664/187(a): Attempted Murder; Statute: 664/187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.53(d): F/Arm:GBI:Com/F; Statute: 12022.53(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 001; Description: PC190.2(a)(17): Murder:Engage In Rob/Rape/Etc (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 190.2(a)(17); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 001; Description: PC189: Offense Was Willful, Deliberate, Premeditated; Statute: 189; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Prescott, Emari; Charge #: 001; Description: PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Statute: 187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siegel, Mark Lloyd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas C. Foster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael