This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 02:51:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Edmond Mathis, III, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 02/11/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Edmond Mathis, III, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Kirihara, John, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry and Baysinger, Robert F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0625

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Kirihara, John

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Baysinger, Robert F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Mathis, Edmond, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Colby, Travis

Morse, Lawrence D.

Creeger, Matthew L

Min, Thomas K

Tresidder, Joseph M.

Madayag, Kimberly

Compton, Misty

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Grove, Allen

Defendant Attorneys

Hegland, Caleb D

Alonso, George L

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Coughlin, Michael

Andrade, Vincent

Lyon, Paul J

Berger, Richard

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Stop Collection of Probation Fees

11/06/2017: Stop Collection of Probation Fees

Abstract of Judgment

07/26/2016: Abstract of Judgment

Notice

07/15/2016: Notice

Release Order

06/27/2016: Release Order

Release Order

03/28/2016: Release Order

Release Order

03/16/2016: Release Order

* Public *

03/16/2016: * Public *

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/12/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

10/15/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

09/30/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

05/19/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Order

03/30/2015: Order

Notice

03/16/2015: Notice

Release Order

02/23/2015: Release Order

Order

02/23/2015: Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

02/23/2015: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Complaint

02/11/2015: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStop Collection of Probation Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DispositionAmended Mandatory Supervision; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Mandatory Supervision; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 02/23/2015; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 02/23/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/20/2016; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/20/2016; Term Type: Middle; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 169 Days; Conduct Credit: 168 Days; Comment: Count 1 PC496d(a); Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • FinancialMathis, Edmond, III; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Mathis, Edmond, III; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DispositionAmended Drug Court; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Drug Court; Probation; Type: Drug Court/Deferred Judgment; Start Date: 02/23/2015; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 02/22/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2015
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Grove, Allen; Defendant: Mathis, Edmond, III; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketArraigned: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Mathis, Edmond, III; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Mathis, Edmond, III; Charge #: 001; Description: PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madayag, Kimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grove, Allen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tresidder, Joseph M.