This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 18:01:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Earl Leon Jones, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Earl Leon Jones, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4546

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jones, Earl Leon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas K

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Galeon, Erica Joy

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/20/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jones, Earl Leon; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Jones, Earl Leon; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jones, Earl Leon; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; EC1109 : Prior Domestic Violence Evidence; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Jones, Earl Leon; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, Earl Leon; Charge #: 001; Description: EC1109 : Prior Domestic Violence Evidence; Statute: 1109; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, Earl Leon; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Galeon, Erica Joy