This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 00:54:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Dylan Urian Blaine, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dylan Urian Blaine, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Nakahara, Vernon K., Hansen, Ronald, Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******242A

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Nakahara, Vernon K.

Hansen, Ronald

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Blaine, Dylan Urian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Compton, Misty

Rosenthal, Sara R

Nored, Thane

Roland, Tracy Marie

Turner, Leslie Allan

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Albertoni, Susan L

Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Benninghoff, Melina

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Andrade, Vincent

Richter, Jonathan J

Davis, William A

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/20/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

02/03/2020: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

09/27/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

09/26/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

09/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/02/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

11/17/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Retained: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Original Type: Report Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Retained: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketRestitution; Original Type: Restitution; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Original Type: Report Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Charge #: 004; Description: PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Statute: 182(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Charge #: 003; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC12022.1: Fel/While On Bail Or Recog; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC484(g)(b): Theft:Misrepresent As Access Card Holder; Statute: 484(g)(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.1: Fel/While On Bail Or Recog; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Blaine, Dylan Urian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC484(g)(b): Theft:Misrepresent As Access Card Holder; Statute: 484(g)(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melina Shalysse Benninghoff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albertoni, Susan L