This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 14:20:12 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Dorine Trimble, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dorine Trimble, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McNatt, Bobby W., Kirihara, John, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7719

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McNatt, Bobby W.

Kirihara, John

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Trimble, Dorine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Compton, Misty

Margain, Andre Carlos

Creeger, Matthew L

Min, Thomas K

Gates, Kathryn

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Green, Anthony C

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

05/22/2019: Evaluation Request

Criminal: Minute Order

05/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

04/25/2019: Evaluation Request

Notice

04/17/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

04/02/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

06/21/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

05/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/04/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

09/05/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/28/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

07/21/2017: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

06/23/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/20/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC487(c): Grand Theft from Person; Prison; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 06/23/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/24/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/23/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/28/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 09/11/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/10/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 05/14/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/22/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 06/24/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 06/24/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 06/24/2019; Term Type: Middle; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 374 Days; Conduct Credit: 374 Days; Comment: Count 1, felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; vop # 3PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; vop # 3PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FinancialTrimble, Dorine; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Trimble, Dorine; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Trimble, Dorine; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Trimble, Dorine; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Trimble, Dorine; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Trimble, Dorine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC211: Robery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Prior Strike (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Trimble, Dorine; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Trimble, Dorine; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Prior Strike (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Trimble, Dorine; Charge #: 001; Description: PC487(c): Grand Theft from Person; Statute: 487(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles