This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 17:01:01 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Derris Ranell Skinner, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Derris Ranell Skinner, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0713

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Skinner, Derris Ranell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Perez, Deborah Najar

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/07/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

02/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Pre-Trial Services Program

02/10/2022: Pre-Trial Services Program

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Services Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Skinner, Derris Ranell; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Skinner, Derris Ranell; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Skinner, Derris Ranell; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perez, Deborah Najar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael