This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 17:03:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Derek Steven Miller, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Derek Steven Miller, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hansen, Ronald, Ash, Carol and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3586

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hansen, Ronald

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Miller, Derek Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Boyer, Kayla A

Margain, Andre Carlos

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/31/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/11/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/11/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Miller, Derek Steven; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Miller, Derek Steven; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Miller, Derek Steven; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Miller, Derek Steven; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Miller, Derek Steven; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Miller, Derek Steven; Charge #: 002; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Miller, Derek Steven; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene