This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 18:00:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Delmer Geronimomatias, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Delmer Geronimomatias, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Lo, Paul, Breen, Thomas P. and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2483

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

Breen, Thomas P.

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Geronimomatias, Delmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

06/23/2021: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/18/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

06/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSubpoenaed: Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Charge #: 002; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Geronimomatias, Delmer; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent