This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 18:11:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Danielle Hathcock Moulton, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Danielle Hathcock Moulton, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0207

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Moulton, Danielle Hathcock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Defendant Attorneys

Perez, Deborah Najar

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/11/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/11/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/20/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/26/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/04/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC451.1(a): Arson with aggravating factors; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Charge #: 001; Description: PC451.1(a): Arson with aggravating factors; Statute: 451.1(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Moulton, Danielle Hathcock; Charge #: 001; Description: PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Statute: 451(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perez, Deborah Najar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent