Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 23:57:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Daniel Emiliano Vasquez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/02/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Daniel Emiliano Vasquez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tsenin, Ksenia, Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Kirihara, John, Jacobs, Harry and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5146

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tsenin, Ksenia

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Kirihara, John

Jacobs, Harry

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hegland, Caleb D

Margain, Andre Carlos

Compton, Misty

McAfee, Michael

Rosenthal, Sara R

Nored, Thane

McKinney, Ilia C.

Wall, Walter W.

Min, Thomas Keynes

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Lope, Armando

Samrao, Ramnik S

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

01/18/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

01/03/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

12/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Returned Mail

10/25/2018: Returned Mail

Affidavit of Probation Violation

07/11/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Peremptory Challenge 170.6

05/25/2018: Peremptory Challenge 170.6

Criminal: Minute Order

01/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

01/10/2018: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

11/14/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

06/15/2017: Collection Statement

Collection Statement

06/15/2017: Collection Statement

Release Order

09/06/2016: Release Order

* Public *

09/06/2016: * Public *

Complaint

08/02/2016: Complaint

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day 2nd Collection Notice (No Civil Assessment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Notice Returned as Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Notice Returned as Undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialVasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Addt'l Collection Notice add Civil Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Prison; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/06/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 01/18/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/06/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 09/26/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 04/21/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/21/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 06/12/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/13/2018; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 01/18/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 01/18/2019; Concurrent: with 18CR-04799; Term Type: Middle; Term: 3 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 289 Days; Conduct Credit: 288 Days; Comment: Count 1; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • FinancialVasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Charge #: 003; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Statute: PC243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Statute: 243(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Statute: 243(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Daniel Emiliano; Charge #: 002; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Statute: PC243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McAfee, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hegland, Caleb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKinney, Ilia C.