This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:22:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Daniel Azevedo Silveira, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Daniel Azevedo Silveira, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David, Hashimoto, Roy, Hollman, James, Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Breen, Thomas P., LaPorte, James and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4239

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Hashimoto, Roy

Hollman, James

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Breen, Thomas P.

LaPorte, James

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Silveira, Daniel Azevedo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Compton, Misty

Rosenthal, Sara R

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/13/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

01/23/2020: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

01/23/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/07/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

12/10/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

09/30/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

05/30/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

08/10/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC602(o): Trespass:Refuse To Leave Property; Dismissed with a Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing: Other; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC602(o): Trespass:Refuse To Leave Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Silveira, Daniel Azevedo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC602(o): Trespass:Refuse To Leave Property; Statute: 602(o); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less