Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/22/2020 at 19:29:21 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Crystal Angel Womack, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Crystal Angel Womack, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, Hollman, James, Shaver, Donald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4673

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Hollman, James

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Womack, Crystal Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Colby, Travis

Roland, Tracy Marie

Min, Thomas Keynes

Compton, Misty

Bakich, Donna

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Hutson, Tina

Rodriguez, Adam J

Lope, Armando

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Foster, Douglas

Andrade, Vincent

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/20/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/10/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

12/19/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

11/22/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Collection Statement

10/16/2019: Collection Statement

Release Order

10/11/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

09/03/2019: Release Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

09/03/2019: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

09/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/20/2019: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/03/2019; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 09/03/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/03/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/08/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/11/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/25/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 12/19/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/30/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 03/19/2020; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Merced Rescue Mission; Ordered; Order Date: 09/03/2019; Party: Womack, Crystal Angel; Order Date: 12/19/2019; Enroll by Date: 12/20/2019; Duration: 9 Months; Comment: Hope for women; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/19/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 48 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 24 Days; Conduct Credit: 24 Days; Comment: VOP #1; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/19/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 81 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 41 Days; Conduct Credit: 40 Days; Comment: VOP #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Womack, Crystal Angel; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Womack, Crystal Angel; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Womack, Crystal Angel; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/03/2019; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 09/03/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/03/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/08/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/11/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/25/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 12/19/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/30/2019; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Merced Rescue Mission; Ordered; Order Date: 09/03/2019; Party: Womack, Crystal Angel; Order Date: 12/19/2019; Enroll by Date: 12/20/2019; Duration: 9 Months; Comment: Hope for women; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/19/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 48 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 24 Days; Conduct Credit: 24 Days; Comment: VOP #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Womack, Crystal Angel; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Womack, Crystal Angel; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant: Womack, Crystal Angel; Contract Public Defender: Hutson, Tina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Womack, Crystal Angel; Charge #: 002; Description: VOP #1PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Womack, Crystal Angel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hutson, Tina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando