This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/31/2021 at 18:00:51 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Cristobal Jimenez Jimenezgomez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Cristobal Jimenez Jimenezgomez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5304

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lozano, Angelica

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC12022.5(a): Used Firearm:Commission Of Fel; Denied; Charge Number: 004; PC246.3(a): Discharge Firearm Grossly Negligent Manner; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Jimenezgomez, Christobal Jimenez; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Charge #: 004; Description: PC246.3(a): Discharge Firearm Grossly Negligent Manner; Statute: 246.3(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Charge #: 003; Description: PC12022.5(a): Used Firearm:Commission Of Fel; Statute: 12022.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Charge #: 003; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Charge #: 002; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Jimenezgomez, Cristobal Jimenez; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene