Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 20:25:46 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Corey Alexander Chapman, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Corey Alexander Chapman, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hashimoto, Roy, Schechter, Jeanne, Shaver, Donald, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Slocum, Steven, Dougherty, Frank and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5875

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hashimoto, Roy

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Slocum, Steven

Dougherty, Frank

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Chapman, Corey Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Roland, Tracy Marie

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Reed, Katharine

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Green, Anthony C

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond SV25-4978375

04/02/2019: Bail Bond SV25-4978375

Criminal: Minute Order

03/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC22107: Unsafe Turn or Lane Change Prohibited (TSE); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC14601.1(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-Not Driving Ability; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; VC23154(a): DUI of Alcohol w/BAC 0.01% or greater when on Probation for Prior DUI; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketBail Bond Exonerated; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant: Chapman, Corey Alexander; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Chapman, Corey Alexander; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Hashimoto, Roy; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Chapman, Corey Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph; Defendant: Chapman, Corey Alexander; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Chapman, Corey Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Citation; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketCitation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Chapman, Corey Alexander; Charge #: 003; Description: VC23154(a): DUI of Alcohol w/BAC 0.01% or greater when on Probation for Prior DUI; Statute: 23154(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Chapman, Corey Alexander; Charge #: 002; Description: VC14601.1(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-Not Driving Ability; Statute: 14601.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Chapman, Corey Alexander; Charge #: 001; Description: VC22107: Unsafe Turn or Lane Change Prohibited (TSE); Statute: 22107; Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine