Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 22:08:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Constance A Page, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Constance A Page, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Ash, Carol and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6272

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Page, Constance Arobian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Compton, Misty

Min, Thomas K

Gates, Kathryn

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Reed, Katharine

Andrade, Vincent

Partin, Lauri L

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/10/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/03/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

02/26/2020: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/26/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/19/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/06/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/04/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/30/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/28/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/23/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/16/2020: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Collection Statement

01/10/2020: Collection Statement

Order

01/09/2020: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/09/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

12/05/2019: Order

Complaint

11/22/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Original Type: Progress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Original Type: Progress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Original Type: Progress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Original Type: Progress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Original Type: Progress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Original Type: Progress Report; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4532(a)(2): Escape Jail/Etc While Chgd w/Misd:Force/Viol; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 12/05/2019; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 12/24/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 12/05/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/17/2020; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/06/2020; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/05/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 180 Days; Comment: Count 1- Felony; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Programs; Behavioral Health Court; Ordered; Party: Page, Constance Arobian; Order Date: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFelony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian; Deputy Public Defender: Partin, Lauri L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC487(a): Grand Theft - Value Exceeding $950.00; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4532(b)(2): Escape Jail/Etc While Chgd w/Fel:Force/Viol; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC504a/PC487(a): Grand Theft By Embezzlement of Property under Lease or Purchase; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Page, Constance Arobian; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Page, Constance Arobian; Charge #: 003; Description: PC487(a): Grand Theft - Value Exceeding $950.00; Statute: 487(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Page, Constance Arobian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC504a/PC487(a): Grand Theft By Embezzlement of Property under Lease or Purchase; Statute: PC504a/PC487(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Page, Constance Arobian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC4532(a)(2): Escape Jail/Etc While Chgd w/Misd:Force/Viol; Statute: 4532(a)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Partin, Lauri L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine