This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 18:03:52 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Christian Arredondo, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Christian Arredondo, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, McCabe, Brian and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3184

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

McCabe, Brian

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Arredondo, Christian Nicholas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Adams, Regina Sonja Lea

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Notice

09/15/2021: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

09/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/30/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/30/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

07/27/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

07/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMotion; Original Type: Motion; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC207(a): Kidnapping; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 003; PC236: False Imprisonment; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Contract Public Defender: Adams, Regina Sonja Lea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Contract Public Defender: Adams, Regina Sonja Lea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 003; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 003; Description: PC236: False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Arredondo, Christian Nicholas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC207(a): Kidnapping; Statute: 207(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adams, Regina Sonja Lea

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene