This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:23:06 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Chong Her, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Chong Her, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4192

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Her, Chong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McAfee, Michael

McKean, Tyler

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/09/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

08/20/2018: Release Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 002; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 002; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 002; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 002; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 003; PC32310: Manufacture/Import/Sell/Give Away Magazine; Dism: Other Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: Her, Chong; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: Her, Chong; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Her, Chong; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 003; Description: PC32310: Manufacture/Import/Sell/Give Away Magazine; Statute: 32310; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 002; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Her, Chong; Charge #: 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent