This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/12/2020 at 19:31:09 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Charles Robert Gutierrez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Charles Robert Gutierrez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Hashimoto, Roy, Kirihara, John and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6745

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Hashimoto, Roy

Kirihara, John

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gutierrez, Charles Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Boyer, Kayla A

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Page, Kathleen Coleen

Jamieson, Stephanie L

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/18/2018: Complaint

Order

01/09/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond SV5-4974921

03/14/2019: Bail Bond SV5-4974921

Criminal: Minute Order

04/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Bail Forfeiture

10/10/2019: Notice of Bail Forfeiture

Criminal: Minute Order

10/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

11/18/2019: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

11/18/2019: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC290.011(a): Failure to Register Transient Status; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 01/06/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 120 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Comment: Count 1; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 11/18/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/17/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/18/2019; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC290.011(a): Failure to Register Transient Status; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC290.011(a): Failure to Register Transient Status; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialGutierrez, Charles Robert; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order - Printed copy with signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMisdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Gutierrez, Charles Robert; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketBail Bond Exonerated; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Gutierrez, Charles Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRequest to Appear (With Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC290.011(a): Failure to Register Transient Status; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Bail Bond; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Gutierrez, Charles Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Gutierrez, Charles Robert; Charge #: 001; Description: PC290.011(a): Failure to Register Transient Status; Statute: 290.011(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamieson, Stephanie L