This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 18:01:40 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Charles Mark Anthony Pond, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Charles Mark Anthony Pond, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Lo, Paul and Hollman, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0232

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

Hollman, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pond, Charles Mark Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Green, Anthony Charles

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/12/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/12/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/20/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/08/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/16/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/22/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/08/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Pond, Charles Mark Anthony; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent