This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/09/2021 at 18:03:44 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Cesar Isaac Chavez Zavala, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Cesar Isaac Chavez Zavala, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Lo, Paul, Slocum, Steven and Hashimoto, Roy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2471

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

Hashimoto, Roy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Zavala, Cesar Isaac

Chavez Zavala, Cesar Isaac

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Galeon, Erica Joy

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

06/18/2021: Release Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

06/18/2021: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

06/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/10/2012: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 08/06/2021; Consecutive: 21CR-00953; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 10 Days; Comment: Count 1- Misdemeanor; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/06/2021; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 08/05/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/06/2021; Fee Totals; $2,274.00; Fee Totals; $2,274.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • FinancialZavala, Cesar Isaac; Transaction Assessment; $2274.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPayment Plan; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Chavez Zavala, Cesar Isaac; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Zavala, Cesar Isaac; Charge #: 002; Description: VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Zavala, Cesar Isaac; Charge #: 001; Description: VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silveira, Nicole A.