This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:03:04 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Carlos Ramon Chavez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Carlos Ramon Chavez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Lacy, Edward M., Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4464

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Lacy, Edward M.

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Chavez, Carlos Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McCoy, Tyson John

Colby, Travis

McAfee, Michael

Boyer, Kayla A

McKean, Tyler

Asdorian, Blake M

Madayag, Kimberly

Creeger, Matthew L

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Miller, Rachel Kohlman

Berger, Richard

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

07/09/2018: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

06/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

06/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

05/04/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

2nd Amended M/O dtd 4/27/18

04/27/2018: 2nd Amended M/O dtd 4/27/18

Amended M/O dtd 4/27/18

04/27/2018: Amended M/O dtd 4/27/18

Criminal: Minute Order

04/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/23/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/02/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRequest to Appear (With Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/09/2018; Concurrent: 18CR-02923; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 48 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 24 Days; Conduct Credit: 24 Days; Comment: Credit for time served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Probation; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 07/31/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 07/31/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/31/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 02/02/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 03/06/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 07/09/2018; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Order Date: 02/02/2018; Enroll by Date: 03/06/2018; Comment: Concurrent with 17CR-02669.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McCoy, Tyson John; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC273.6: Court order violation: civil code and code of civil procedure; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.6: Court order violation: civil code and code of civil procedure; Statute: 273.6; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Chavez, Carlos Ramon; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Rachel Kohlman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott