This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:40:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Carlos Maldonado, Junior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Carlos Maldonado, Junior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nakahara, Vernon K. and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-RF

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nakahara, Vernon K.

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Maldonado, Carlos, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

Nored, Thane

Colby, Travis

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Green, Anthony C

Berger, Richard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

01/31/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Abstract of Judgment

12/21/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

12/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Memorandum

12/05/2018: Memorandum

Abstract of Judgment

11/07/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Notice

11/06/2018: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

10/29/2018: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

10/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint: Deemed Information

10/15/2018: Complaint: Deemed Information

Criminal: Minute Order

10/15/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

09/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

09/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketOrder For Victim Restitution; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestitution; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestitution; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestitution; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Maldonado, Carlos, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Maldonado, Carlos, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint: PC1387.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Carlos, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Carlos, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: *VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Carlos, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: *VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Carlos, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKean, Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Min, Thomas Keynes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colby, Travis