This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 20:38:21 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Caleb Adam Lewallen, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Caleb Adam Lewallen, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, Kirihara, John, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven, Dougherty, Frank, Kalustian, Richard P. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2447

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Kirihara, John

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Dougherty, Frank

Kalustian, Richard P.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lewallen, Caleb Adam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mckinney, Michael C

Nored, Thane

Compton, Misty

Sandhaus, David

Hanson, Ann

Rosenthal, Sara R

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Gates, Kathryn

Egan, Gerad Denis

McKean, Tyler

Defendant Attorneys

Richter, Jonathan J

Falasco, Dominic J.

Meyer, Derek Scott

Partin, Lauri Louise

Rodriguez, Adam J

Andrade, Vincent

Rhodes, Leanna M

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

06/27/2019: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

06/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

04/04/2018: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/04/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/20/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

* Public *

08/01/2016: * Public *

Notice

07/26/2016: Notice

Declaration

04/12/2016: Declaration

Complaint

04/12/2016: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Probation; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/01/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/01/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/01/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 09/12/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/04/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 04/04/2018; Status; Status: Extended; Date: 02/27/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 03/27/2019; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 04/08/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/03/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Found True by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Found True

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Lewallen, Caleb Adam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Hanson, Ann; Defendant: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Contract Public Defender: Rhodes, Leanna M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Mckinney, Michael C; Defendant: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lewallen, Caleb Adam; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Statute: PC243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rhodes, Leanna M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Falasco, Dominic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richter, Jonathan J