This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 17:02:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Brayan Adalberto Anaya Flores, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Brayan Adalberto Anaya Flores, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4084

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

09/03/2021: Bail Bond

Complaint

09/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23153(a): DUI of Alcohol with Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 001; VC23560: Second Offense; Punishment; Denied; Charge Number: 002; VC23153(b): DUI .08 Alcohol With Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 002; VC23560: Second Offense; Punishment; Denied; Charge Number: 003; VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 003; Description: VC14601.2(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-DUI; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23560: Second Offense; Punishment; Statute: 23560; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23153(b): DUI .08 Alcohol With Bodily Injury; Statute: 23153(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23560: Second Offense; Punishment; Statute: 23560; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: AnayaFlores, Brayan Adalberto; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23153(a): DUI of Alcohol with Bodily Injury; Statute: 23153(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene